Strickland v. Kinkennon et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Strickland
Defendant: Paxton Media Group, LLC, John Does 1-10 and Jamime M. Kinkennon
Case Number: 1:2021cv00088
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Remark; copy of #29 ORDER REMANDING CASE forwarded to Alcorn County Circuit Court (jla)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Alcorn County Circuit Court. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 6/23/21. (jla)
June 22, 2021 Filing 28 BRIEF re #27 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Daniel, Josh)
June 22, 2021 Filing 27 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paxton Media Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Affidavit of Eric Rudolf) (Daniel, Josh)
June 22, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (McNees, Edward)
June 21, 2021 Filing 25 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Copy of Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certified Copy of Complaint, #3 Exhibit Certified Copy of Summons issued to Jamime M. Kinkennon and executed Return, #4 Exhibit Certified Copy of Summons issued to Paxton Media Group, LLC and executed Return, #5 Exhibit Certified Copy of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (McNees, Edward)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/21/21. (bnd)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/21/21. (bnd)
June 21, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 6/21/2021. (rtc)
June 21, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #21 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (McNees, Edward)
June 14, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever by Paxton Media Group, LLC. (Daniel, Josh)
June 14, 2021 Filing 19 BRIEF re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Dismissal . (Daniel, Josh) Modified on 6/16/2021 (jla).
June 14, 2021 Filing 18 EXHIBIT re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Dismissal . (Daniel, Josh) Modified on 6/16/2021 (jla).
June 14, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Dismissal, by Paxton Media Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Affidavit of Eric Rudolf) (Daniel, Josh) Modified on 6/16/2021 (jla).
June 14, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Paxton Media Group, LLC. (Daniel, Josh)
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Paxton Media Group, LLC's Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Josh R. Daniel on behalf of Paxton Media Group, LLC. (Daniel, Josh)
June 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Core Information by Edward R. McNees on behalf of Jamime M. Kinkennon to All Counsel of Record. (McNees, Edward)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Jamime M. Kinkennon. (McNees, Edward)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Thomas O. Cooley on behalf of Sharon Strickland. (Cooley, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/25/21. No document attached. (rtc)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/24/21. (bnd)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/24/21. (bnd)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by Jamime M. Kinkennon. (McNees, Edward)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dan W. Webb on behalf of Paxton Media Group, LLC (Webb, Dan)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Paxton Media Group, LLC. (Daniel, Josh)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Josh R. Daniel on behalf of Paxton Media Group, LLC (Daniel, Josh)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/20/2021. (rtc)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 JOINDER to Defendant Jamime M. Kinkennon's Notice of Removal. (Webb, Dan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Jamime M. Kinkennon, Paxton Media Group, LLC, filed by Sharon Strickland. (jla)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jamime M. Kinkennon from Alcorn County Circuit Court, case number CV2021-080KMA. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1949688) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Jamime M. Kinkennon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 7.22.2020 Demand Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
May 19, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strickland v. Kinkennon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Strickland
Represented By: Thomas O. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paxton Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Represented By: Josh R. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamime M. Kinkennon
Represented By: Brad Best
Represented By: Edward R. McNees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?