Horn v. Lee County Adult Jail Med. Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Jason E. Horn
Defendant: Lee County Adult Jail Med. Dept., Jamie Burrell, Ronnie Partlow and Jim H. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00118
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order Spears Hearing. (cb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (cb)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 11/18/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/20/21. (cb)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/20/21. (cb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 DECLINATION to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Sharion Aycock no longer assigned to the case. (cb)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 8/20/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/21. (cb)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason E. Horn. (cb)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Jason E. Horn. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Lee County Adult Jail Med. Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason E. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Adult Jail Med. Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Partlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?