Protective Life Insurance Company v. Remmers et al
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Linda Remmers and Kimberly Remmers
Cross Defendant: Claude Plaxico
Case Number: 1:2021cv00134
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335); STIPULATION for Protective Life Insurance Company's Deposit of Proceeds, Discharge, and Dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/6/21. (jla)
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Claude Plaxico. (Phipps, Rebecca)
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Claude Plaxico (jla)
October 4, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #13 Joint MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335); Section 5(B) of Administrative Procedures for ECF states proposed orders are not to be filed as an attachment to a pleading; attorney to email proposed order to chambers. (jla)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) STIPULATION for Protective Life Insurance Company's Deposit of Proceeds, Discharge, and Dismissal by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Butler, Thomas) Modified on 10/7/2021 (jla).
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Claude Plaxico by Kimberly Remmers, Linda Remmers. (Wise, Anthony)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2021 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/17/2021. (rtc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Julian Butler on behalf of Protective Life Insurance Company Kimberly Remmers served on 9/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Butler, Thomas)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Julian Butler on behalf of Protective Life Insurance Company Linda Remmers served on 9/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Butler, Thomas)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Rhett Wise on behalf of Kimberly Remmers, Linda Remmers (Wise, Anthony)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/14/21. (jla)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Julian Butler on behalf of Protective Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Summons) (Butler, Thomas)
September 10, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 Summons Returned Executed; A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (jla)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Julian Butler on behalf of Protective Life Insurance Company Claude Plaxico served on 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Proof of Service) (Butler, Thomas)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Claude Plaxico, Kimberly Remmers, Linda Remmers; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Claude Plaxico, Kimberly Remmers, Linda Remmers; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Butler, Thomas)
August 30, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1991816, filed by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protective Life Insurance Company v. Remmers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Julian Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Remmers
Represented By: Anthony Rhett Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Remmers
Represented By: Anthony Rhett Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Claude Plaxico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?