Leach v. United States of America
Petitioner: James Rudy Leach
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00146
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order Dismissing Case by James Rudy Leach. (cb)
November 19, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number MSN300028346 (tab)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order Dismissing Case. (cb)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of DISMISSAL. DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/9/21. (cb) Modified on 11/10/2021 (cb).
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Letter/Correspondence from James Rudy Leach. (cb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner has twenty-one (21) days fromthe date of this Order to pay the filing fee, or this action may be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/6/21. (cb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Rudy Leach. Document submitted electronically. (cb) Modified on 9/29/2021 (cb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document submitted electronically. (cb) Modified on 9/29/2021 (cb).
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Lee County), filed by James Rudy Leach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D): Document submitted electronically.(cb) Modified on 9/29/2021 (cb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leach v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Rudy Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?