Superior Foam, LLC v. Demilec (USA) Inc.
Plaintiff: Superior Foam, LLC doing business as Dixie Foam
Defendant: Demilec (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00153
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 1/24/2022 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Demilec (USA) Inc. answer due 12/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/2021. (yf)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Demilec (USA) Inc. n/k/a Huntsman Building Solutions (USA) LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by Demilec (USA) Inc.. (Rippee, Stephanie)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/25/2021. (yf)
October 25, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Demilec (USA) Inc. answer due 11/5/2021. (yf)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Demilec (USA) Inc.. (Rippee, Stephanie)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL by Stephanie McGee Rippee on behalf of Demilec (USA) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Docket Report, #2 Exhibit 2-Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3-Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4-Summons-Demilec (USA) Inc., #5 Exhibit 5-Summons Returned Executed-Demilec (USA) Inc., #6 Exhibit 6-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Rippee, Stephanie) Modified on 10/15/2021 (jla).
October 12, 2021 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry 1. (jla)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2021 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/6/2021. (rtc)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Demilec (USA) Inc. answer due 10/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/6/2021. (yf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Demilec (USA) Inc.. (Rippee, Stephanie) Modified on 10/6/2021 (jla).
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Demilec (USA) Inc., n/k/a Huntsman Building Solutions (USA) LLC. (Rippee, Stephanie)
October 4, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Rippee, Stephanie)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Demilec (USA) Inc., filed by Superior Foam, LLC. (tab)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Demilec (USA) Inc. from Circuit Court of Clay County, MS, case number 21-CV-128K. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMNSNDC-2007788) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Demilec (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
October 1, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Superior Foam, LLC v. Demilec (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Superior Foam, LLC doing business as Dixie Foam
Represented By: Lydia Quarles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demilec (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie McGee Rippee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?