Bell v. Caring Hearts and Hands House, LLC
Plaintiff: Percy Lee Bell, Sr.
Defendant: Caring Hearts and Hands House, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00154
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Caring Hearts and Hands House, LLC. (jla)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order to Show Cause. (tab)
November 8, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number MSN300028301 (tab)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/04/2021. (ajs)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #3 Notice of Assignment. (jtm)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically (jtm)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/8/2021. (yf)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Percy Lee Bell, Sr. (tab)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by Percy Lee Bell, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A EEOC Charge of Discrimination) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Caring Hearts and Hands House, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Lee Bell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caring Hearts and Hands House, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?