Bruister v. American General Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Carroll Bruister, III
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company, Jerry Pugh, Joe Medders and John Does A through E
Case Number: 1:2022cv00049
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 16 Initial Disclosures by Lance L. Stevens on behalf of Carroll Bruister, III to American General Life Insurance company; Jerry Pugh; Joe Medders and John Does A-E. (Stevens, Lance)
May 6, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Joe Medders. (Nettles, Laura)
May 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT by Carroll Bruister, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Stevens, Lance) Modified on 5/6/2022 (jla).
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2022 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 5/9/2022. PLEASE READ THE INITIAL ORDER CAREFULLY AS HIGHLIGHTED PORTIONS RELATE TO NEW LOCAL RULES AND NEW CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FORM. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/13/2022. (jf)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/13/22. (def)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Jerry Pugh. (Herring, Calvin)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Calvin Paige Herring on behalf of Jerry Pugh (Herring, Calvin)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Joe Medders. (Wilbanks, Charles)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Jerry Pugh. (Wilbanks, Charles)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Issued Summons, #4 Summons Summons - Return of Service, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal) (Stewart, Glen)
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to State Court Complaint by American General Life Insurance Company. (Stewart, Glen)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT of American General Life Insurance Company. (Stewart, Glen)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against American General Life Insurance Company, John Does A through E, Joe Medders, Jerry Pugh, filed by Carroll Bruister, III. (tab)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jerry Pugh, Joe Medders, American General Life Insurance Company, John Does A through E from Circuit Court of Choctaw County, Mississippi, case number 2021-054-CV-L. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2071925) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Jerry Pugh, Joe Medders, American General Life Insurance Company, John Does A through E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B Affidavit of Jerry Pugh, #2 Exhibit C Affidavit of Joe Medders, #3 Exhibit D State Court Record, #4 Exhibit E State Court Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
March 16, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruister v. American General Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Bruister, III
Represented By: Lance L. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Glen Austin Stewart
Represented By: Ray Anthony Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Pugh
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Represented By: Calvin Paige Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Medders
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Catherine Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A through E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?