Dream Catcher Hotels, LLC v. Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company
Counter Defendant: Dream Catcher Hotels, LLC
Counter Claimant: Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00054
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 8/4/2022 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Dream Catcher Hotels, LLC by Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company. (Pittman, Camp)
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Greer Burdick Mallette on behalf of Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company (Mallette, Greer)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2022 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/19/22. (rtc)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company answer due 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/19/2022. (yf)
April 18, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company. (Pittman, Camp)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Camp Pittman on behalf of Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company (Pittman, Camp)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay Marshall Atkins on behalf of Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company (Atkins, Jay)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William R. Bradley, Jr on behalf of Dream Catcher Hotels, LLC Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company served on 3/30/2022. (Bradley, William)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Bradley, William)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2075191, filed by Dream Catcher Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
March 24, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dream Catcher Hotels, LLC v. Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dream Catcher Hotels, LLC
Represented By: William R. Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Johnston-Tombigbee Furniture Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Greer Burdick Mallette
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Represented By: Camp Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?