Royal v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: April Royal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00055
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Motion #2 DENIED. The Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to pay the filing fee. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/10/2022. (ajs)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by April Royal. Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/31/22. (def)
March 28, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by April Royal. (jwr)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by April Royal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Royal
Represented By: Michael Burnis McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?