Anders Construction, Inc. v. Westfield Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anders Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00056
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Reply now due by 5/26/2022. No further written order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/20/2022. (No document attached.) (ajs)
May 20, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
May 20, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. Replies due by 5/26/2022. (jla)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Memorandum by Westfield Insurance Company. (Getz, Joseph) Modified on 5/20/2022 (jla).
May 13, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #11 Memorandum in Support re #10 Response in Opposition; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
May 12, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion #5 MOTION for Stay filed by Anders Construction, Inc.. (Warren, G.) Modified on 5/13/2022 (jla).
May 12, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Anders Construction, Inc.. (Warren, G.)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. Responses now due by 5/12/2022. No further written order will issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/28/2022. (No document attached). (ajs)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Anders Construction, Inc.. (Warren, G.)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE due to #5 Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/20/22. (cs)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration. (Getz, Joseph)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Westfield Insurance Company. (Getz, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G. Martin Warren, Jr on behalf of Anders Construction, Inc. Westfield Insurance Company served on 3/28/2022. (Warren, G.)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Warren, G.)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Westfield Insurance Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 28, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2075843, filed by Anders Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Invoices, #3 Exhibit C - Payment Bond, #4 Exhibit D - Proof of Claim, #5 Exhibit E - Letter to Westfield, #6 Exhibit F - Letter from Westfield, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anders Construction, Inc. v. Westfield Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anders Construction, Inc.
Represented By: G. Martin Warren, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Scialdone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph T. Getz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?