State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00075
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice.. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 7/7/2022. (tab)
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to The United States of America (jla)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mandatory Electronic Filing as to Victoria Lynn McDonald. (jwr)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2100158, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
May 25, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Louis Jay Miller
Represented By: Victoria Lynn McDonald
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?