North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc. v. Quartiz Technologies
Plaintiff: North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Quartiz Technologies a d/b/a of Value Ascent Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: LaKeysha Greer Isaac
2 Judge: Carlton W Reeves
3 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #46 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim . (Coffman, Andrew) Modified on 3/1/2023 (jla).
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.. (Coffman, Andrew) Modified on 3/1/2023 (jla).
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by Andrew W. Coffman on behalf of North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc. re #44 Summons Returned Executed, #27 MOTION to Dismiss Urgent and Necessitous Motion to Dismiss - LETTER TO JUDGE REEVES (Coffman, Andrew)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew W. Coffman on behalf of North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc. Quartiz Technologies served on 2/14/2023. (Coffman, Andrew)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #27 MOTION to Dismiss Urgent and Necessitous Motion to Dismiss, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Hearing : Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2023 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Carlton W Reeves, Courtroom 5B, Jackson, MS. (trs)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #42 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc. by Quartiz Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit August 22, 2018, Agreement and Amendments, #2 Exhibit May 11, 2022, Email from Daphne Clement to Eldo Mathew, #3 Exhibit November 11, 2022 Correspondence from Eldo Mathew to Bruce Toppin) (Webb, Taylor)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #41 Reply to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Urgent and Necessitous Motion to Dismiss filed by Quartiz Technologies. (Webb, Taylor) Modified on 2/13/2023 (jla).
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Urgent and Necessitous Motion to Dismiss filed by Quartiz Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mitchell Hagman Email) (Webb, Taylor)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Hearing as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (Morgan, Damonta)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #39 Response in Opposition to Motion, #27 MOTION to Dismiss Urgent and Necessitous Motion to Dismiss filed by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.. (Coffman, Andrew)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Urgent and Necessitous Motion to Dismiss filed by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.. (Coffman, Andrew)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W Reeves: Status Conference held on 1/26/2023 via zoom. PARTICIPANTS: Andrew W. Coffman and Mark Nolan Halbert (Plaintiff's counsel); Dan W. Webb and Taylor Hamilton Webb (Defendant's counsel). The hearing was held to discuss the setting of TRO hearing and deadlines. An order is forthcoming. (trs)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlton W. Reeves and US Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers, Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders no longer assigned to case. For chambers contact information please see the following web site. ( # **www.mssd.uscourts.gov/judges-information** ). Signed by Chief District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/25/2023. (jtm)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 1/24/2023. (jtm)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/20/2023. (jtm)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Michael P. Mills recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 1/20/2023. (jwr)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/20/2023. (jtm)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE Cancelling Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Hearing set for 1/20/2023. (tjw)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Quartiz Technologies; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER regarding subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/19/23. (def)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/19/2023 --Exhibits Admitted. (def)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Conference:Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 9:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jf)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Urgent and Necessitous Motion to Dismiss . (Webb, Taylor)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Urgent and Necessitous Motion to Dismiss by Quartiz Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - August 22,2018 Agreement and Amendments, #2 Exhibit 2 - Third Affidavit of Eldo Matthew) (Webb, Taylor)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Chris Davis, #2 Exhibit B - E-mail from Clement to Davis 1-12-2023, #3 Exhibit C - Quartiz PowerPoint Presentation) (Halbert, Mark)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Taylor Hamilton Webb on behalf of Quartiz Technologies of Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SDTs) (Webb, Taylor)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #23 Response in Opposition to #8 Motion, filed by Quartiz Technologies. (Webb, Taylor) Modified on 1/17/2023 to link to motion (jwr).
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by Quartiz Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Affidavit of Eldo Mathew, #2 Exhibit August 22, 2018, Agreement and Amendments, #3 Exhibit Composite of Emails Between NMMC and Quartiz Surrounding Agreement Drafting, #4 Exhibit Composite of May 19, 2020, Emails Between Eldo Mathew and Ben Kilman, #5 Exhibit Quartiz Internal Meeting Notes, #6 Exhibit Application to Register Foreign LLC for CDK Innovations LLC, #7 Exhibit October 7, 2022 Correspondence from Bruce Toppin to Eldo Mathew, #8 Exhibit Composite of Emails Between Eldo Mathew, Bruce Toppin, Chris Davis, and Nancy Corby, #9 Exhibit November 11, 2022 Correspondence from Eldo Mathew to Bruce Toppin, #10 Exhibit May 11, 2022, Email from Daphne Clement to Eldo Matthew) (Webb, Taylor)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule re #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Response due by 1/13/2023. Reply due by 1/17/2023. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/10/23. (sko)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/10/23. (def)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Quartiz Technologies answer due 2/9/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/10/23. (def)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2023 re #13 MOTION to Expedite Urgent and Necessitous Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Quartiz Technologies *Audio Recorded during Proceeding.. (def)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Hearing : Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2023 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 Memorandum in Support, #13 MOTION to Expedite Urgent and Necessitous Motion for Expedited Discovery, #16 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.. (Coffman, Andrew)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Expedite Urgent and Necessitous Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.. (Coffman, Andrew)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Expedite Urgent and Necessitous Motion for Expedited Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2023 11:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (def)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Expedite Urgent and Necessitous Motion for Expedited Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Quartiz Proposed Discovery) (Webb, Taylor)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite Urgent and Necessitous Motion for Expedited Discovery by Quartiz Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Quartiz - Proposed Discovery) (Webb, Taylor)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE Cancelling Telephonic Conference set for 1/10/2023. (tjw)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 Clerk Certification, #3 Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons issued to Quartiz, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Notice of Appearance by Andrew Coffman, #8 Order Setting Hearing, #9 Notice of Hearing, #10 Affidavit of Service of Summons to Quartiz, #11 Notice of Appearance by Taylor Webb, #12 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Webb, Dan)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc. . (Halbert, Mark)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.. (Halbert, Mark)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Expedite Hearing by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Order Setting, #3 Exhibit C - Master Services Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - 10-7-2022 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - 11-11-2022 Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of John Christopher Davis) (Halbert, Mark)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Quartiz Technologies. (Webb, Taylor)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Conference set for 1/10/2023 11:45 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before District Judge Sharion Aycock. Call-in information will be provided to counsel of record by separate email. (tjw)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/4/23. (jla)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quartiz Technologies . (Webb, Taylor)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dan W. Webb on behalf of Quartiz Technologies (Webb, Dan)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Quartiz Technologies, filed by North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc. (jtm)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Quartiz Technologies from Circuit Court of Lee County, Mississippi, case number CV22-112. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2185697) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Quartiz Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C, Secretary of State Website Information, #4 Exhibit D, Virginia Secretary of State Website Information, #5 Exhibit E, Affidavit of Eldo Mathew, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Clerks Notice: Please take notice that a F.R.C.P. 7.1 disclosure statement has not been filed in this case. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required statement. (jtm)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H. Davidson and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc. v. Quartiz Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Coffman
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Quartiz Technologies a d/b/a of Value Ascent Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Hamilton Webb
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?