Delk v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Delk
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., John Doe Entities 1-5 and John Doe Persons 1-5
Case Number: 1:2023cv00052
Filed: April 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Delk by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. (Virden, Britt)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE Cancelling Settlement Conference at parties' request. No further notice will issue. No document attached. (cs)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 9/23/2024 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (mga)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 1/26/2024. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 9/22/2023. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 11/24/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 12/22/2023. Motions due by 2/9/2024. Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2023 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/26/2023. (jf)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/23/2023. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Delk by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. (Virden, Britt)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Pamela Delk by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. (Virden, Britt)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Emily Clair Bradley on behalf of Pamela Delk. (Bradley, Emily)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pamela Delk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SOS Walmart Associates, #2 Exhibit SOS Walmart, Inc, #3 Exhibit Amended Proofs, #4 Exhibit Second Proofs) (Hazzard, Brent)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Delk by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. (Virden, Britt)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Pamela Delk by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. (Virden, Britt)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 5/29/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/23/2023. (mga)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Virden, Britt)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Pamela Delk. (Hazzard, Brent)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure regarding diversity by Brent Hardy Hazzard on behalf of Pamela Delk to WAL-MART, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P., WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC., WAL-MART STORES, INC.,. (Hazzard, Brent)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2023 at 9:30 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 6/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/18/2023. (jf)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE AS TO PLAINTIFF Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Clair Bradley on behalf of Pamela Delk Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 4/27/2023. (Bradley, Emily)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Clair Bradley on behalf of Pamela Delk Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. served on 4/27/2023. (Bradley, Emily)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Clair Bradley on behalf of Pamela Delk Wal-Mart, Inc. served on 4/27/2023. (Bradley, Emily)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Clair Bradley on behalf of Pamela Delk Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. served on 4/26/2023. (Bradley, Emily) Modified on 5/12/2023 (jla).
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. to Plaintiff Pamela Delk. (Virden, Britt)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Virden, Britt)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Virden, Britt)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. . (Virden, Britt)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (jla)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2226638, filed by Pamela Delk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event "Disclosure Statement" to file the required statement. (jwr)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delk v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Delk
Represented By: Brent Hardy Hazzard
Represented By: Emily Clair Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Persons 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?