Sanders v. Fitch et al
Petitioner: David Sanders
Respondent: Lynn Fitch and Burl Cain
Case Number: 1:2023cv00105
Filed: August 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Sanders (Doc 18) (jla)
August 14, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
August 14, 2023 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:23-cv-00322. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - ORDERED that this Petition for habeas relief and other documents filed in the instant civil action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, Aberdeen Division. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/14/2023 (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
August 14, 2023 District Transfer Out to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, Aberdeen Division. (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
August 14, 2023 Remark: Emailed IT Department to electronically transfer case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, Aberdeen Division. Clerk will docket confirmation email when received from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, Aberdeen Division. (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
August 7, 2023 Filing 15 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus in Response to #14 ORDER, filed by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parole Board Warrant, #2 Exhibit B - Parole Revocation Hearing, #3 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO RESPOND - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, for the reasons stated above, the Clerk of Court shall mail pro se Petitioner David Sanders a form 28 U.S.C. 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, consistent with this Order, Petitioner shall complete the form, sign it under oath, and file it with the Court no later than August 9, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 7/26/2023 (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as set out in the Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on July 26, 2023. (SP) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 19, 2023 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 5088. (KNS) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 18, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (VM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 14, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to be Released from Custody Today by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CO) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on July 11, 2023. (RHP) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 10, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Court Hearing, and MOTION to be Reinstated Parole filed by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing, filed by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Subpoena M.D.O.C. S.O.P. concerning C.O.U.I.C., filed by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, filed by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by David Sanders. Amendment to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Supporting docs., #2 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
June 6, 2023 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: on or before 6/23/2023, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 5/24/2023 (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.]
May 22, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Monroe) filed by David Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/14/2023.] Modified on 8/14/2023 (jla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Fitch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lynn Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?