Chapman v. Wren et al
Plaintiff: Annie J Chapman and Annie J. Chapman
Defendant: Raymond W Wren, Morgan Steel, LLC and Raymond W. Wren
Case Number: 1:2023cv00112
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Morgan Steel, LLC, Raymond W. Wren . (Meehan, Donna)
October 6, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Morgan Steel, LLC, Raymond W. Wren. (Meehan, Donna)
October 3, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allen Austin Vollor on behalf of Annie J. Chapman Raymond W. Wren served on 9/26/2023. (Vollor, Allen)
September 21, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allen Austin Vollor on behalf of Annie J. Chapman Morgan Steel, LLC served on 9/15/2023 (Vollor, Allen) Modified on 9/22/2023 (jla).
September 20, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 Summons Returned Executed; Attorney to refile return to include copy of issued summons. (jla)
September 19, 2023 Filing 8 DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allen Austin Vollor on behalf of Annie J. Chapman Morgan Steel, LLC served on 9/15/2023. (Vollor, Allen) Modified on 9/22/2023 (jla).
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Re-Issued as to Morgan Steel, LLC, Raymond W Wren. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jwr)
September 12, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Annie J Chapman. (Vollor, Allen)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Leave To Amend. Plaintiff shall file Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of today's date. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/11/2023. (sko)
September 11, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Response to Order to Show Cause; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b) states that an application for relief or other action by the court must be presented by a motion. Attorney directed to file Motion. (jla)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Vollor, Allen)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO JURISDICTION. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/29/23. (sko)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Morgan Steel, LLC, Raymond W Wren. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (lgm)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2286733, filed by Annie J Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lgm)
August 28, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (lgm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Wren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie J Chapman
Represented By: Allen Austin Vollor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie J. Chapman
Represented By: Allen Austin Vollor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond W Wren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Steel, LLC
Represented By: Donna M. Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond W. Wren
Represented By: Donna M. Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?