Cadence Bank v. GlobalVision Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cadence Bank
Defendant: GlobalVision Systems, Inc. and AI Oasis, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00139
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Transferred case opened in Central District of California as 2:23cv9281, filed 11/2/2023. (jla)
November 1, 2023 Case Transferred to Central District of California pursuant to Order #17 . Transferred electronically via CM/ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jtm)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA; CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 10/31/2023. (rmw)
October 31, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AI Oasis, Inc. . (Bragg, Grafton)
October 31, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GlobalVision Systems, Inc. . (Bragg, Grafton)
October 30, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE as to GlobalVision Systems, Inc. and AI Oasis, Inc.: F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(1) requires the filing of a corporate statement by any nongovernmental corporate party that (A) identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock; or (2) states that there is no such corporation. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required corporate statement. (jla)
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cadence Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of B.Stubbs) (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 27, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #13 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
October 26, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc.. (Bragg, Grafton) Modified to link to underlying motion on 10/27/2023 (jla).
October 26, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (as renewed by Dkt. 11) filed by AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration of Catherine Lew with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit - Declaration of Michael Chen with Exhibits, #3 Exhibit - Declaration of Oliver Song with Exhibits, #4 Exhibit - Declaration of Ronaldo Chen with Exhibits, #5 Exhibit - Declaration of Paul Chan with Exhibits) (Bragg, Grafton)
October 25, 2023 Filing 11 Response to #10 Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Defs Special Appearance, #2 Exhibit 2. Defs 12b2 Mtn to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 3. Rule 41 Dismissal, #4 Exhibit 4. CA GlobalVision Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5. 2023.10.18 email re dismissal, #6 Exhibit 6. 2023.10.19-20 email chain, #7 Exhibit 7. Declaration of B.Stubbs) (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 10/20/2023. (rmw)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/19/23. (jla)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/19/23. (jla)
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Alexander Purvis on behalf of Cadence Bank (Purvis, John)
October 18, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cadence Bank re Diversity. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cadence Bank. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Cadence Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Software License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B. First Amendment to SLA, #3 Exhibit C. Second Amendment to SLA, #4 Exhibit D. AIO Articles of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit E. GVS Statement of Information, #6 Exhibit F. AIO Statement of Information, #7 Exhibit G. Communications from C.Lew, #8 Exhibit H. Copyright Reports, #9 Exhibit I. Invoice from GVS, #10 Exhibit J. Stubbs Declaration, #11 Exhibit K. Rule 65 Cert of Counsel) (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cadence Bank . (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AI Oasis, Inc., GlobalVision Systems, Inc.. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2309890, filed by Cadence Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Software License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - First Amendment to SLA, #3 Exhibit C - Second Amendment to SLA, #4 Exhibit D - AIO Articles of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit E - GVS Statement of Information, #6 Exhibit F - AIO Statement of Information, #7 Exhibit G - Communications from C. Lew, #8 Exhibit H - Copyright Reports, #9 Exhibit I - Invoice from GVS, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
October 18, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
October 18, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadence Bank v. GlobalVision Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadence Bank
Represented By: Erin Diane Saltaformaggio
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlobalVision Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Grafton Eric Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AI Oasis, Inc.
Represented By: Grafton Eric Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?