Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC v. Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC
Defendant: Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc., Dura Coat Products, Inc., Axalta Coating Systems LTD. and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2023cv00145
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss filed by Axalta Coating Systems LTD., Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc., Dura Coat Products, Inc. (Frost, Cable) Modified on 12/5/2023 (jwr).
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss. Reply now due by 12/4/2023. No further Order shall issue from this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/22/23. (no document attached) (sko)
November 22, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Unopposed); All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dakota J. Stephens on behalf of Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC (Stephens, Dakota)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Response in Opposition to Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss (Unopposed) by Axalta Coating Systems LTD., Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc., Dura Coat Products, Inc.. (Frost, Cable) Modified on 11/22/2023 to link to underlying motion (jla).
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss filed by Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dan Keown, #2 Exhibit B - Alabama 2023 Annual Reports for DPI & Dura Coat, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jason Nicholson, #4 Exhibit D - LinkedIn Profiles of Greg Stanek and Tim Russell) (Pickett, Kaytie)
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 12/11/23 re #11 Order Staying Case (no document attached) (rtc)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/3/23. (rrh)
November 2, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss filed by Axalta Coating Systems LTD., Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc., Dura Coat Products, Inc.. (Frost, Cable)
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss by Axalta Coating Systems LTD., Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc., Dura Coat Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC Purchase Order - ER003933, #2 Exhibit Heflin Declaration with Exhibit A) (Frost, Cable)
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC . (Pickett, Kaytie)
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Cable Matthew Frost on behalf of Axalta Coating Systems LTD., Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc., Dura Coat Products, Inc. of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons - Dura Coat Products of Alabama, #3 Exhibit Summons - Dura Coat Products, Inc., #4 Exhibit Summons - Axalta Coating Systems Ltd, #5 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed - Dura Coat Product of Alabama Inc., #6 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed - Axalta Coating Systems Ltd) (Frost, Cable)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2023 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/27/23. (rtc)
October 26, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dura Coat Products, Inc. . (Frost, Cable)
October 26, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc. . (Frost, Cable)
October 26, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Axalta Coating Systems LTD. . (Frost, Cable)
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC. (jwr)
October 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dura Coat Products, Inc., Axalta Coating Systems LTD., Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc. from Circuit Court of Lowndes County, Mississippi, case number 2023-0183. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2313107) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Dura Coat Products, Inc., Axalta Coating Systems LTD., Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Annual Report, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David Heflin, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Court File, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
October 26, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event "Disclosure Statement" to file the required statement. (jwr)
October 26, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC v. Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steel Dynamics Columbus, LLC
Represented By: Adam Stone
Represented By: Kaytie M. Pickett
Represented By: Dakota J. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dura Coat Products of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Cable Matthew Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dura Coat Products, Inc.
Represented By: Cable Matthew Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axalta Coating Systems LTD.
Represented By: Cable Matthew Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?