Minga v. Regions Bank, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martha K. Minga
Defendant: Regions Bank, Inc. doing business as Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage and Corelogic Tax Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00010
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE Resetting Conference:Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 3/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 3/19/2024. (jf)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Amended. (Burwell, Todd)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CoreLogic Tax Services, LLC. (Burwell, Todd)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CoreLogic Tax Services, LLC. (Burwell, Todd)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1:Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2024 at 9:30 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 3/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 02/08/2024. (jf)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Rule 4 Summons - Regions and CoreLogic, #4 Proof of Service re Rule 4 Summons - Regions, #5 Proof of Service re Rule 4 Summons - CoreLogic, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Burwell, Todd)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Regions Bank, Inc.. (Hembree, George)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. CoreLogic Tax Services, LLC's answer due 2/22/2024; Regions Bank, Inc.'s answer due 1/30/2024. No further order will issue from this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/23/24. (No document attached.) (cs)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Regions Bank, Inc.. (Hembree, George)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by CoreLogic Tax Services, LLC. (Burwell, Todd)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Regions Bank, Inc. . (Hembree, George)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Corelogic Tax Services, LLC . (Burwell, Todd)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Corelogic Tax Services, LLC, Regions Bank, Inc., filed by Martha K. Minga. (jla)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corelogic Tax Services, LLC, Regions Bank, Inc. from Monroe County Circuit Court, case number 2023-396-JWM. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSNDC-2342781) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Corelogic Tax Services, LLC, Regions Bank, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Texas Franchise Tax Public Information Report, #4 Exhibit D - State of CA Statement of Information LLC, #5 Exhibit E - State of CA Statement of Information Corporation, #6 Exhibit F - MS SOS Certificate of Good Standing, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minga v. Regions Bank, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha K. Minga
Represented By: S. Carter Dobbs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank, Inc. doing business as Regions Bank doing business as Regions Mortgage
Represented By: George D. Hembree, III
Represented By: Lindsay K. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic Tax Services, LLC
Represented By: Todd Todd Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?