Johnston v. One America Productions, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Ellen Johnston alleges that defendants (1) invaded her privacy by filming her without her consent and showing her image in the movie Borat, and (2) portrayed her in a false light by showing her with her arms raised while Borat pretended to speak in tongue.

Plaintiff: Ellen Johnston
Defendant: One America Productions, Inc. and Twentieth Century-Fox Film Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv00042
Filed: March 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Delta Division Office
County: Coahoma
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27
ORDER STAYING CASE, including the case management conference previously scheduled for 10/23/2007, pending decision on interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Eugene M. Bogen on 10/18/2007. (maw, USDC)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge W. Allen Pepper, Jr. on 10/02/2007. (pbs, USDC)
September 24, 2007 Filing 25
REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Alter Judgment dated August 22, 2007 or, in the Alternative, to Certify the Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Entry of a Stay MOTION to Alter Judgment dated August 22, 2007 or, in the Alternative, to Certify the Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Entry of a Stay filed by One America Productions, Inc., Twentieth Century-Fox Film Corporation. (Henegan, John)
September 18, 2007 Filing 24
RESPONSE to Motion re 21 MOTION to Alter Judgment dated August 22, 2007 or, in the Alternative, to Certify the Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Entry of a Stay MOTION to Alter Judgment dated August 22, 2007 or, in the Alternative, to Certify the Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Entry of a Stay filed by Ellen Johnston. (Luckett, William)
September 5, 2007 Filing 23
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by One America Productions, Inc., Twentieth Century-Fox Film Corporation. (Henegan, John)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2007, 11:00 AM in Judge Bogen's Chambers before Eugene M. Bogen. FOURTEEN (14) days PRIOR to the Case Management Conference counsel shall submit to the Magistrate Judge a memorandum (3 page maximum). Signed by Judge Eugene M. Bogen on 8/23/07. (bdm, USDC)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 18 Order on Motion to Dismiss and Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge W. Allen Pepper, Jr. on 8/22/2007. (pbs, USDC)
August 15, 2007 Filing 17
RESPONSE in Support re 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Response to Motion, Exhibits A-E to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by One America Productions, Inc.. (Jacobs, Donna)
August 8, 2007 Filing 16
RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Response to Motion, Exhibits A-E to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Ellen Johnston. (Luckett, William)
July 24, 2007 Filing 15
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Response to Motion, Exhibits A-E to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Henegan, John)
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11
ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed ore tenus motion for additional time to file rebuttal regarding motion to dismiss and to file an opposition to plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint. Responses due July 24, 2007. Signed by Judge W. Allen Pepper on 7/06/07. (pwh, USDC)
June 20, 2007 Filing 9
NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Exhibit 2 to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John C. Henegan on behalf of One America Productions, Inc., Twentieth Century-Fox Film Corporation. (Henegan, John)
June 1, 2007 Filing 6
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Everyman Pictures. (Luckett, William)
March 20, 2007 Filing 3
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge W. Allen Pepper, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Allan Alexander. (kmt, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. One America Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Johnston
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One America Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Brown Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twentieth Century-Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Donna Brown Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?