JTH Tax, Inc. v. Mahmood et al
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, Inc.
Defendant: Nayyer Mahmood, Sehr Mahmood and First Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00134
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Delta Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 5/27/2010. (pls, USDC)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 97 Motion for Discovery. Signed by David A. Sanders on 3/26/10. (DAS)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting defendants' ore tenus motion for additional pages. Signed by David A. Sanders on 3/22/10. (ncb, USDC)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 92 Motion to Strike. Defendants to respond to 86 MOTION to Change Venue by 3/08/2010; Plaintiff to reply by 3/12/2010. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 3/01/2010. (pbs, USDC)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CORRECTED ORDER. Signed by David A. Sanders on 8/14/09. (ncb, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax, Inc. v. Mahmood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph William Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nayyer Mahmood
Represented By: Gary Alvin Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sehr Mahmood
Represented By: Gary Alvin Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Alvin Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?