King v. W. W. Grainger Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony King
Defendant: W. W. Grainger Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00016
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Delta Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 147 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; adopting 166 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/8/2012. (psk)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 159 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff is granted 3 days from this date to file a response that complies with Rule 7(b)(5), and defendant shall file an expedited reply, within 3 days of the filing of plaintiff's response. Signed by Jane M Virden on 1/3/12. (ncb)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER extending time for plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Jane M Virden on 12/14/11. (ncb)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Jane M Virden on 12/13/11. (ncb)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Motions terminated: 109 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Response (Doc #100) to Defendant's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Set Aside Jury Trial Setting filed by W. W. Grainger Inc ., 124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 109 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Response (Doc #100) to Defendant's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Set Aside Jury Trial Setting filed by W. W. Grainger Inc., 87 MOTION to Set Aside <I, 87 MOTION to Set Aside Jury Trial Setting filed by W. W. Grainger Inc..; denying 87 Motion to Set Aside ; granting 109 Motion to Strike ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 124 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 10/18/2011. (pls)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying 130 Motion to Compel. Signed by Jane M Virden on 10/12/2011. (sef)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER finding as moot 92 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 96 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 97 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 101 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part 102 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 105 Motion to Quash. Signed by Jane M Virden on 8/15/11. (ncb)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Strike. Signed by David A. Sanders on 4/13/2011. (sef)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 36 Motion. Signed by David A. Sanders on 4/6/2011. (sef)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 22 Motion to add documents to the recordto add documents to the record; granting 23 Motion to add documents to the recordto add documents to the record. Signed by David A. Sanders on 3/29/2011. (sef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. W. W. Grainger Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. W. Grainger Inc.
Represented By: Henry F. Galatz
Represented By: Matthew Gary Gallagher
Represented By: Steven Hymowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?