Wheat v. Strickland et al

Plaintiff: Frances Z. Wheat
Defendant: John Howard Strickland, Jr., John Howard Strickland and Jennifer Strickland
Case Number: 3:2013cv00087
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying (109) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:13-cv-00087-SA-DAS; denying (99) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:13-cv-00088-SA-DAS. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/6/2015. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00087-SA-DAS, 3:13-cv-00088-SA-DAS (bkl)
March 6, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re (133 in 3:13-cv-00087-SA-DAS, 121 in 3:13-cv-00088-SA-DAS) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/6/2015. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00087-SA-DAS, 3:13-cv-00088-SA-DAS (bkl)
March 10, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Frances Z. Wheat against John Howard Strickland, Jr. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/10/2015. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00087-SA-DAS, 3:13-cv-00088-SA-DAS (bkl)
March 10, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE by reason of bankruptcy pending. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/10/2015. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00087-SA-DAS, 3:13-cv-00088-SA-DAS (bkl)
March 13, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/13/2015. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-00087-SA-DAS, 3:13-cv-00088-SA-DAS (bkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheat v. Strickland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Z. Wheat
Represented By: J. Rhea Tannehill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Howard Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Robert S. Addison
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Howard Strickland
Represented By: Robert S. Addison
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Strickland
Represented By: Robert S. Addison
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.