Cotton v. GGNSC Batesville, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Shirley Cotton
Defendant: GGNSC Batesville, LLC, GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC, Golden Living and Golden Living-Center
Case Number: 3:2013cv00169
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Panola
Referring Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/16/16. (jtm)
January 7, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/7/16. (jtm)
March 24, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/24/15. (bds)
July 23, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Reconsideration re 21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; denying 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/23/14. (bds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotton v. GGNSC Batesville, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Cotton
Represented By: Peter Byron Gee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Batesville, LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Living
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Living-Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?