de Graffenried v. Smithway Motor Xpress, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael A. de Graffenried
Defendant: Smithway Motor Xpress, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00009
Filed: January 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 79 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/4/2016. (dbm)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 33 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/22/2014. (dlh)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 23 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/12/2014. (bkl)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff leave to amend complaint. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/8/2014. (bkl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: de Graffenried v. Smithway Motor Xpress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. de Graffenried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithway Motor Xpress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?