Tacket v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Dianne Tacket
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Advanced Healthcare Management and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2015cv00045
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Pontotoc
Presiding Judge: Neal B. Biggers
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 81 Order. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 11/21/2016. (llw)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 49 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/16/2016. (llw)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Joinder; denying 36 Renewed Motion for Remand-Related Discovery. Defendant Guardian hereby is allowed seven (7) days from the date of this order to respond to the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's Reply is due seven (7) days after the filing of Defendant Guardian's Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/05/2015. (lec)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 23 Motion for Remand-Related Discovery. The parties' briefing of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 15 shall resume pursuant to the court's prior Order 22 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 06/16/2015. (lec)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STAYING CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS. Should the parties desire to undertake remand related discovery, they should contact the court within seven (7) days hereof for scheduling of same. Plaintiff shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge within seven (7) days of a decision on the motion to remand and shall submit a proposed order lifting the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 04/27/2015. (lec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tacket v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Tacket
Represented By: Bertis Wayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Steven H. Begley
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Healthcare Management
Represented By: Andy Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?