Allstate Insurance Company v. Scarbrough
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, Kimberly Holloway and Rachel Holloway
Defendant: John Robert Scarbrough
Case Number: 3:2015cv00114
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER denying 192 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 5/16/2017. (lpm)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 135 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 3/20/2017. (lpm)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 121 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 9/22/16. (bnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Scarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Jenessa Carter Hicks
Represented By: David E. Rozier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Robert Scarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?