Stafford v. DeSoto Acquisition and Development Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jenny Stafford
Defendant: DeSoto Acquisition and Development Corporation, Memphis Street Cafe, LLC and Natalia Gudkovskaya
Case Number: 3:2015cv00140
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION AND ORDER granting 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 66 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/5/17. (tab)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER; Statement of jurisdiction establishing complete diversity must be filed by Monday, October 5, 2015, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/02/2015. (bbf)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER; Statement of jurisdiction establishing complete diversity must be filed within five (5) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 09/21/2015. (bbf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford v. DeSoto Acquisition and Development Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Stafford
Represented By: David Reid Wamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeSoto Acquisition and Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Street Cafe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalia Gudkovskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?