Smith v. Union Standard Insurance Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Anthony Smith
Defendant: Union Standard Insurance Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00162
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying Second 141 Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 6/22/2017. (lpm)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion in Limine; granting 172 Motion in Limine; granting 174 Motion in Limine; granting 178 Motion in Limine; denying 180 Motion in Limine; granting 182 Motion in Limine; denying 184 Motion in Limine; granting 186 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 6/13/2017. (lpm)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying 138 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 6/6/2017. (lpm)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 81 Motion to Compel Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 07/29/16. (sd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Union Standard Insurance Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Smith
Represented By: William H. Jones
Represented By: Logan Shane Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Standard Insurance Group, LLC
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Represented By: Harry Case Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?