Martinez v. Tri-State Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: Angel Martinez
Defendant: Tri-State Enterprises LLC, Regina Brock, Michael L. Brock and Lee Brock
Case Number: 3:2016cv00032
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 11/16/18. (lpm)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 134 Motion for Discovery Out of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/29/18. (bfg)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/6/17. (ncb)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/22/17. (ncb)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Approving Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/7/17. (ncb)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Contempt; granting 47 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/13/17. (ncb)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Compel; denying 33 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/15/16. (ncb)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER awarding fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/11/16. (ncb)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Sanctions. Within 7 days of this date, counsel for Plaintiff must file an affidavit supporting any reasonable fees and costs incurred in filing the instant motion. All fees and costs must be itemized. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/6/16. (ncb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Tri-State Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Martinez
Represented By: Jerry Wesley Hisaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?