Hill v. State of Mississippi
Petitioner: Billy Dale Hill
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2016cv00061
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: Neal B. Biggers
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Clarify; REINSTATING Memorandum Opinion; Final Judgment and Certificate of Appealability; Petition is dismissed with prejudice both as successive and as untimely filed. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/6/18. (jla)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/30/17. (cr)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 6 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Dale Hill, Motions terminated: 6 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Billy Dale Hill., State of Mississippi answer due 7/5/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/19/16. (rel) Modified on 4/19/2016 (rel).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Dale Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?