Great American Life Insurance Company v. Tanner et al
Plaintiff: Great American Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Ava Mitchell Tanner, Alita Margaret Mitchell and Craig J. Cheatham
Case Number: 3:2016cv00070
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER denying (249) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-cv-00070-DMB. Plaintiffs are permitted to propound discovery relevant and proportional to execution on the judgment. Defendants will have 30 days from service thereof to respond in accordance with the applicable provisions of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/4/21. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00070-DMB, 3:18-cv-00023-DMB (ncb)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER denying as moot 235 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 242 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/1/2020. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00070-DMB, 3:18-cv-00023-DMB (jtm) Modified on 7/1/2020 (jla).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 JUDGMENT in favor of Ava Mitchell Tanner, Phyllis Fernandez against Alita Cheatham Mitchell, Craig Cheatham, DIRECTING Clerk to pay Ava Mitchell Tanner the amount of the annuities on deposit with the Court. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/31/20. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00070-DMB, 3:18-cv-00023-DMB (jla)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying (192) Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Rhonda Gentry, M.D. in case 3:16-cv-00070-DMB-JMV; denying (66) in case 3:18-cv-00023-DMB-JMV. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/1/19. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00070-DMB-JMV, 3:18-cv-00023-DMB-JMV (jtm)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/28/19. (bfg)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting (185) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:16-cv-00070-DMB-JMV. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/25/19. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00023-NBB-RP, 3:16-cv-00070-DMB-JMV (tab)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 175 Motion to Stay; that the final judgment 173 is stayed pending appeal.. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/27/18. (tab)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 FINAL JUDGMENT case dismissed re 170 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/8/18. (tab)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion for Summary Judgment; and that Summary Judgment on underlying interpleader action is granted in Ava's favor. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/2/18. (tab)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 AMENDED ORDER re 153 Order on Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/12/17. (tab)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/18/17. (jtm)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT re 136 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/7/17. (tab)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting in part and deferred in part 67 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and deferred in part 67 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/29/16. (tab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Life Insurance Company v. Tanner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Randy L. Dean
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava Mitchell Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alita Margaret Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig J. Cheatham
Represented By: J. Hale Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?