Smith v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Fred Smith
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Brunini, Grantham, Grower & Hewes, PLLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00092
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Vacate; denying 30 Motion to Dismiss; denying 30 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/12/2018. (dbm)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying as moot 27 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 24 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 25 Motion to Vacate ; denying 26 Motion to Vacate. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/31/2017. (dbm)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/13/16. (jtm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: Sheryl Bey
Represented By: William Dement Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunini, Grantham, Grower & Hewes, PLLC
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: William Dement Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?