Alexander v. Hood et al
Plaintiff: Effort Alexander
Defendant: Jim Hood and DeSoto County Soil and Water Conservation District
Case Number: 3:2016cv00202
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 64 Order on Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/16/17. (jtm)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Relief from Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/20/17. (ncb)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Reconsider Prior Order 34 Denying Motion to Disqualify Lee Davis Thames as Defense Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/27/2017. (bbf)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 31 Motion under Rule 60(b) and Rule 103 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/12/2016. (bbf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Hood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Effort Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hood
Represented By: Lee Davis Thames, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeSoto County Soil and Water Conservation District
Represented By: Lee Davis Thames, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?