Ingram v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Krystal M. Ingram
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, United Student Aid Funds, Inc., Navient Solutions, Inc., United States Department of Education and The University of Phoenix, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00210
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Tunica
Presiding Judge: Neal B. Biggers
Presiding Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 131 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's Complaint Dismissed. Case Closed. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 04/27/2018. (bds)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 129 Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 02/12/2018. (bds)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/13/17. (cs)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 81 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 06/08/2017. (bds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal M. Ingram
Represented By: Christopher Ethan Kittell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Bilbija
Represented By: F. Ewin Henson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell O. Driskell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Student Aid Funds, Inc.
Represented By: Blythe K. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Blythe K. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Stuart Sheffield Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Phoenix, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Gary Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?