Hoskins v. Droder et al

Plaintiff: LaLangie Hoskins
Defendant: Eugene Droder, III and Angel Contreras
Case Number: 3:2017cv00224
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Panola
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (37) Motion to Dismiss; granting (39) Motion to Dismiss; granting (48) Motion to Dismiss; granting (50) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:17-cv-00224-MPM-JMV. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 11/5/2018. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00224-MPM-JMV, 3:18-cv-00099-MPM-JMV (lpm)
October 12, 2018 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 10/12/2018. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00224-MPM-JMV, 3:18-cv-00099-MPM-JMV (lpm)
July 3, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/3/18. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00224-MPM-JMV, 3:18-cv-00099-MPM-JMV (ncb)
April 24, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 14 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 17 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/24/18. (ncb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins v. Droder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaLangie Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Droder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?