Griffin et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Griffin and Annie Y. Griffin
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc., Jauregui & Lindsey, LLC and Grandview Lakes Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00146
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Adair Talley on behalf of Grandview Lakes Homeowner's Association, Inc. (Talley, Robert)
August 8, 2018 Filing 20 Response to #16 Amended / Supplement to Document Plaintiffs' Supplement to its Motion to Remand and for Stay of all Proceedings Pending Resolution of Remand Motion #4 MOTION to Remand . (Vance, Bradley) Modified on 8/9/2018 (jla).
July 26, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #19 Response in Support of Motion, #18 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #17 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Please re-file each of these attaching the correct documents. (edc)
July 25, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Grandview Lakes Homeowner's Association, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Holly)
July 25, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly R. Ratcliff on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. (Ratcliff, Holly)
July 25, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly R. Ratcliff on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Removal) (Ratcliff, Holly)
July 20, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B Certified (Green Cards), #3 Exhibit C Summons) (tab)
July 19, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MS Secretary of State Record) (Vance, Bradley)
July 18, 2018 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order Staying Case. (jtm)
July 16, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Jerry Wesley Hisaw on behalf of Grandview Lakes Homeowner's Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Consent to Removal (Hisaw, Jerry)
July 13, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Merger, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2017 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Federal Court's Order of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2014 State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Chancer Court Dismissal of 2014 matter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Opinions) (Vance, Bradley)
July 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Vance, Bradley)
July 13, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,, . (Vance, Bradley)
July 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Wesley Hisaw on behalf of Grandview Lakes Homeowner's Association, Inc. (Hisaw, Jerry)
July 10, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Doc 2 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Doc 4 - Summons Jauregui & Lindsey, #4 Exhibit Doc 5 - Application for TRO, #5 Exhibit Doc 6 - POS - CitiMortgage, #6 Exhibit Doc 7 - POS Jauregui & Lindsey, #7 Exhibit Doc 8 - First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Doc 9 - Summons Grandview Lake Homeowners Assoc, #9 Exhibit Doc 10 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Vance, Bradley)
July 10, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #6 State Court Record - Removal - Attorney to refile State Court Record with the Certificate of State Court Clerk as the main document, and each state court document attached and identified as a separate PDF in accordance with Local Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for ECF. (jtm)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/10/18. (ncb)
July 9, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Vance, Bradley)
July 2, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of authorities IN SUPPORT of re #4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Annie Y. Griffin, Frederick Griffin. (edc)
July 2, 2018 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and for stay of all proceedings pending resolution of Remand Motion by Annie Y. Griffin, Frederick Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (edc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm) (Main Document 3 corrected and replaced on 6/28/2018) (jtm)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against CitiMortgage, Inc., Jauregui & Lindsey, LLC, filed by Annie Y. Griffin, Frederick Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jtm)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CitiMortgage, Inc. from Chancery Court of DeSoto County, Mississippi, case number 18-cv-1068. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1568228) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Secretary of State Record, #3 Exhibit C - Real Property, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley B. Vance
Represented By: Holly R. Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jauregui & Lindsey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandview Lakes Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry Wesley Hisaw
Represented By: Robert Adair Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Y. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?