State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Samsung SDI America, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., John and Jane Does 1-10 and ABC Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 3:2018cv00166
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2018 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/24/18. (rtc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Harris, Bridget)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Amazon.com, Inc. answer due 10/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/24/18. (cs)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bridget K. Harris on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Harris, Bridget)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Samsung SDI America, Inc.. (Brannen, Franklin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Samsung SDI America, Inc.. (Brannen, Franklin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Hinshaw, Corey)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Lee Gladden, Jr on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Samsung SDI America, Inc. served on 9/7/2018. (Gladden, David)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Lee Gladden, Jr on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Amazon.com, Inc. served on 9/6/2018. (Gladden, David)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc., Samsung SDI America, Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Amazon.com, Inc.; and Samsung SDI America, Inc. (jla)
July 30, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P. Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1579073, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hoverboard Order, #2 Exhibit B - Hoverboard Order, #3 Exhibit C - Photos, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: David Lee Gladden, Jr.
Represented By: Bridget K. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin P. Brannen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?