Helmert v. Cenlar FSB et al
Plaintiff: John C. Helmert, Jr.
Defendant: Cenlar FSB and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00194
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Instructions for Forms 1099-A and 1099-C, #2 Exhibit 2 - Form 1099-A) (Handy, Kye)
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 11/13/2018 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
October 23, 2018 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/18. To be reset. (rtc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kittell, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John C. Helmert, Jr. (Kittell, Christopher)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Christopher Ethan Kittell on behalf of John C. Helmert, Jr to Defendants. (Kittell, Christopher)
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure of Core Information by Kye CNee' Handy on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC to Plaintiff. (Handy, Kye)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Erin Diane Saltaformaggio on behalf of Cenlar FSB to All parties. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE STATEMENT SUPPLEMENTAL. (Handy, Kye)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cenlar FSB. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kittell, Christopher)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John C. Helmert, Jr. (Kittell, Christopher)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Handy, Kye)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Handy, Kye)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Substitute Trustee's Deed) (Handy, Kye)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2018 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/12/18. (rtc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION To Dismiss filed by Cenlar FSB. (Saltaformaggio, Erin) Modified on 9/13/2018 (jla).
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Cenlar FSB. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Cenlar FSB, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, filed by John C. Helmert, Jr. (jla)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cenlar FSB from Lafayette County Circuit Court, case number L18-214. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1593858) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Cenlar FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helmert v. Cenlar FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Erin Diane Saltaformaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Donald Alan Windham
Represented By: Kye CNee' Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Helmert, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Ethan Kittell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?