Thomson v. Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Robert J. Thomson
Defendant: Mr. Clinton L. Boutwell and Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00195
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Neal B Biggers
1 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2018 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/10/18. (rtc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis H. Watson, Jr on behalf of Clinton L. Boutwell, Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC (Watson, Louis)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Norris, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Clinton L. Boutwell, Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC. (Norris, Robert)
October 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Clinton L. Boutwell answer due 10/20/2018; Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC answer due 10/20/2018. (jla)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bailey Hill Dorsey on behalf of Robert J. Thomson Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC served on 9/29/2018. (Dorsey, Bailey) Modified on 10/4/2018 (jla).
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bailey Hill Dorsey on behalf of Robert J. Thomson Clinton L. Boutwell served on 9/29/2018. (Dorsey, Bailey) Modified on 10/4/2018 (jla).
September 11, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Clinton L. Boutwell, Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1593769, filed by Robert J. Thomson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Verification In Support of Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomson v. Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Clinton L. Boutwell
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grillehouse of Southaven, LLC
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Thomson
Represented By: Bailey Hill Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?