Franklin v. GGNSC Southaven LLC et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Franklin
Defendant: Unidentified Entities 1-10, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, John Does 1-10, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, Shirley Crump and Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00196
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Neal B Biggers
1 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 27 Response to #23 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Chaffin, Douglas)
October 26, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendant Shirley Crump . (Dillard, Lamar)
October 26, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendant Shirley Crump by Shirley Crump, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
October 26, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #23 Response in Opposition to Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Dillard, Lamar) Modified on 10/29/2018 (jla).
October 26, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Shirley Crump, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Shirley Crump) (Dillard, Lamar)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/17/18. (ncb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Michelle Franklin. (Chaffin, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michelle Franklin. (Chaffin, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Lamar Bradley Dillard on behalf of Shirley Crump, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rasmussen Affidavit) (Dillard, Lamar) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jla).
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Lamar Bradley Dillard on behalf of Shirley Crump, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Holly Rasmussen-Jones Affidavit) (Dillard, Lamar)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Douglas Bryant Chaffin on behalf of Michelle Franklin Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Certificate of Expert Consultation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Expert Consultation) (Chaffin, Douglas) Modified on 10/2/2018 (jla).
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/20/2018. (irw)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference RESET for 9/20/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Defense's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. No document attached. (irw)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/20/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Defense's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay all Non-Arbitration Related Discovery by Shirley Crump, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Shirley Crump. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Golden Gate Ancillary LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by GGNSC Clinical Services LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by GGNSC Holdings LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by GGNSC Administrative Services LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by GGNSC Southaven LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and for Leave to Conduct Limited Arbitration Related Discovery . (Dillard, Lamar)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and for Leave to Conduct Limited Arbitration Related Discovery by Shirley Crump, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - arbitration agreement) (Dillard, Lamar)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of clerk, #2 Exhibit docket, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit certificate of expert consultation, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit notice of service of discovery) (Dillard, Lamar)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Shirley Crump, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC, filed by Michelle Franklin. (tab)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, Shirley Crump, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC from Circuit Court of DeSoto County, MS, case number CI2018-189CWD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1594005) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC, GGNSC Administrative Services LLC, GGNSC Holdings LLC, Golden Gate Ancillary LLC, GGNSC Clinical Services LLC, Shirley Crump, Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summonses and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. GGNSC Southaven LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Ancillary LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Equity Holdings LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Clinical Services LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Southaven LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Holdings LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Crump
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate National Senior Care LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Franklin
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller
Represented By: Douglas Bryant Chaffin
Represented By: James B. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?