K & J Enterprises, LLC v. The City of Oxford, Mississippi
Plaintiff: K & J Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: The City of Oxford, Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2018cv00209
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 11/5/2018. (jwr)
November 2, 2018 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by The City of Oxford, Mississippi. (Mallette, Pope)
October 25, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 12/3/2018 03:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Circuit Court Fee Bill, #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) (Mallette, Pope)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/11/18. (jtm)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #20 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/11/18. (jtm)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #5 Motion for TRO; denying #5 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/09/2018. (mga)
October 9, 2018 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2018 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Stay filed by K & J Enterprises, LLC --Exhibits Admitted. (Court Reporter Phyllis McLarty.) (mga)
October 9, 2018 Filing 27 Exhibit List as to motion for preliminary injunction. (mga)
October 9, 2018 Filing 26 Witness List as to motion for preliminary injunction. (mga)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/09/2018. (mga)
October 9, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Rebuttal in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief by The City of Oxford, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Rebuttal) (Mallette, Pope)
October 8, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Stay filed by K & J Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Melton Quote) (West, Benjamin)
October 8, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Stay filed by K & J Enterprises, LLC. (West, Benjamin)
October 8, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Stay filed by K & J Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit City of Oxford Security Camera Maintenance Records, #2 Exhibit City Budget Performance Report - 2% Food & Beverage Fund) (West, Benjamin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION to Stay filed by The City of Oxford, Mississippi. (Mallette, Pope) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jla).
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Stay filed by The City of Oxford, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - OPD Safety Assessment, #2 Exhibit B - Oct. 3, 2017 BOA Meeting Minutes, #3 Exhibit C - May 15 BOA Meeting Minutes w/ Ordinance, #4 Exhibit D - Adopted Ordinance) (Mallette, Pope)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Bowie Watkins, Jr on behalf of The City of Oxford, Mississippi (Watkins, Paul)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2018 02:30 PM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (mga)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Michael P. Mills recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 10/2/18. (tab)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 10/1/18. (jtm)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Mauldin on behalf of The City of Oxford, Mississippi (Mauldin, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (West, Benjamin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (West, Benjamin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION to Stay by K & J Enterprises, LLC. (West, Benjamin)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2018 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/26/18. (rtc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The City of Oxford, Mississippi. (Mallette, Pope)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against The City of Oxford, Mississippi, filed by K & J Enterprises, LLC. (jtm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The City of Oxford, Mississippi from Circuit Court of Lafayette County, Mississippi, case number L18-426. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1599188) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by The City of Oxford, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)
September 25, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K & J Enterprises, LLC v. The City of Oxford, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Oxford, Mississippi
Represented By: Pope S. Mallette
Represented By: Paul Bowie Watkins, Jr.
Represented By: John Andrew Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K & J Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin D. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?