CECA, LLC v. Metal Impact South, LLC

Plaintiff: CECA, LLC
Defendant: Metal Impact South, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00010
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time , First MOTION for Discovery by CECA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of B. Sean Akins in Support of Motion for Extension of Time) (Akins, B.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Metal Impact South, LLC. (Bradley, Jacob)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Metal Impact South, LLC. (Bradley, Jacob)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 10/22/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 4/8/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/22/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/22/2019. Motions due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/6/19. (rtc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 3/6/2019. (rtc)
March 4, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #15 Notice of Service: Attorney to refile complete document. (jwr)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sheldon Alston by B. Sean Akins on behalf of CECA, LLC to Jacob Bradley. (Akins, B.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Metal Impact South, LLC. (Alston, Sheldon)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Metal Impact South, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Supply Agreement, #2 Exhibit B, Invoices, #3 Exhibit C, 05.24.18 Email from CECA, #4 Exhibit D, Credit Memos, #5 Exhibit E, Affidavit of Phil Kretekos) (Alston, Sheldon)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of Metal Impact South, LLC to CECA, LLC. (Bradley, Jacob)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Metal Impact South, LLC. (Alston, Sheldon)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of Plaintiff's #9 Response to Defendant's #6 Motion to Transfer filed by CECA, LLC. (Akins, B.) Modified on 2/12/2019 to link to underlying motion (jtm).
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by CECA, LLC. (Akins, B.)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/18/19. (rtc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Metal Impact South, LLC. (Alston, Sheldon)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by Metal Impact South, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Supply Agreement) (Alston, Sheldon)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Metal Impact South, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supply Agreement) (Alston, Sheldon)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of Metal Impact South, LLC (Bradley, Jacob)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint, #2 Summons Summons with Executed Proof of Service) (Alston, Sheldon)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Metal Impact South, LLC, filed by CECA, LLC. (jwr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metal Impact South, LLC from Circuit Court of Tippah County, case number CV2018-184. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1633373) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Metal Impact South, LLC. (jwr) (#1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CECA, LLC v. Metal Impact South, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECA, LLC
Represented By: B. Sean Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Impact South, LLC
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: Jacob A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?