Parker v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: John Alexander Parker
Defendant: Commissioner Pelicia Hall, Michael Dean, Patricia Doty and Warden Harold Taylor
Case Number: 3:2019cv00011
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued. (cr)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Spears Hearing RESET for 5/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jf)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order, Set Hearings. (cr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Plaintiff for 2/28/2019. (jf)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Spears Hearing set for 2/28/2019 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/29/19. (cr)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/29/19. (cr)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND CERTIFICATION TO CONTINUE LAWSUIT. (cr)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 2/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/19. (cr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Alexander Parker. (cr)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement filed by John Alexander Parker. (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alexander Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Harold Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?