Allred v. Flagg et al
Petitioner: Bobby Glyn Allred
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Mississippi and Verlena Flagg
Case Number: 3:2019cv00012
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions,. (cr)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #3 Order. (cr)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, Acknowledgment filed by Attorney General of the State of Mississippi, Verlena Flagg. (Owens, Jerrolyn)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING STATE TO RESPOND Attorney; General of the State of Mississippi answer due 4/8/2019; Verlena Flagg answer due 4/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/18/19. (cr) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jla).
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P. Mills and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cr)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS - #1 Petition is to be restricted to parties only. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/15/19. (cr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby Glyn Allred. (cr)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Union) filed by Bobby Glyn Allred. (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allred v. Flagg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Verlena Flagg
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobby Glyn Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?