Crawford v. DeSoto County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Paul Crawford
Defendant: DeSoto County, State of Mississippi, Officer John Doe II, DeSoto County Sheriff's Department and Officer John Doe I
Case Number: 3:2019cv00013
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of supplemental discovery responses by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of DeSoto County Sheriff's Department, DeSoto County, State of Mississippi to All Counsel. (Allen, R.)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 3/27/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
March 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of DeSoto County Sheriff's Department, DeSoto County, State of Mississippi (Submission of Attorney's Fees) (Allen, R.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of discovery responses by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of DeSoto County Sheriff's Department, DeSoto County, State of Mississippi to Plaintiff's counsel. (Allen, R.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/19. (rtc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference not held on 3/4/2019. (rtc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of written discovery by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of DeSoto County, State of Mississippi to All Counsel. (Allen, R.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of DeSoto County Sheriff's Department, DeSoto County, State of Mississippi to All Counsel. (Allen, R.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by DeSoto County Sheriff's Department, DeSoto County, State of Mississippi. (Allen, R.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Clerk, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Service, #4 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Allen, R.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Response to #4 Response . (Allen, R.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Response to #1 Notice of Removal,,, . (Shah, Azki)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/23/19. (rtc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul Crawford. (jwr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DeSoto County Sheriff's Department, DeSoto County, State of Mississippi from Circuit Court of Desoto County, case number CI2019-028. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number MSN300023415) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by DeSoto County Sheriff's Department, DeSoto County, State of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
January 22, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. DeSoto County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Crawford
Represented By: Azki Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeSoto County, State of Mississippi
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeSoto County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?