The Bank of New York Mellon v. Dickerson et al
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: The Internal Revenue Service, Tammie R. Dickerson, Jeffrey L. Dear and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00027
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notices of Federal Tax Liens, #2 Exhibit B - Payoff Calculator) (Davis, Stuart)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Party. United States of America added. The Internal Revenue Service terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/6/19. (tab)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Party and Amend Caption by The Internal Revenue Service. (Davis, Stuart)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/25/19. (rtc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer The Internal Revenue Service answer due 4/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/25/19. (cs)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons (WC Lamar), #4 Exhibit Summons (T Dickerson), #5 Exhibit Summons (J Dear), #6 Exhibit Lis Pendens Notice, #7 Exhibit Summons Return (J Dear), #8 Exhibit Summons Return (T Dickerson), #9 Exhibit Alias Summons (IRS - Atty Gen), #10 Exhibit Alias Summons (IRS - WC Lamar), #11 Exhibit Application for Entry of Default, #12 Exhibit Entry of Default (J Dear), #13 Exhibit Entry of Default (T Dickerson), #14 Exhibit Alias Summons Return (IRS - WC Lamar), #15 Exhibit Alias Summons Return (IRS - Atty Gen)) (Davis, Stuart)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court, by The Internal Revenue Service. (Davis, Stuart)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Jeffrey L. Dear, Tammie R. Dickerson, The Internal Revenue Service, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (jtm)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Internal Revenue Service from Chancery Court of Desoto County, Mississippi, case number 18-cv-211. Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by The Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Dickerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammie R. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Dear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Benjamin Gilbert Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?