L.L.D., LLC et al v. Enpro Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennie M. Clement, Robert O. Walker, 2 Hill LLC, Mildred M. Carpenter, Erik Fearing, Virginia Wood, William M. (Mike) Williamson, Willis Van Winkle, Fountain Square Professional Suites, LLC, Emily M. Childs, Clara Spence, Nathaniel Ferguson, Lauren Ferguson, Annie Fondon, Michael Fondon, Bobby H. Clark, B. J. Crawford, LLC, Barbara A. Colson, Lorrie C. Williamson, Jason Paysinger, Jennifer Hill, James M. Colson, III, Kimberly Fearing, Anita S. Mcgehee, L.L.D. LLC, Marjorie Reid, James L. Oliphant, Rebecca R. Jones, Jill A. Clark, Tyler Hill, Billy D. Childs, John Wood, Margie P. French, Pamela A. Coe, Beverly Jean Walker, Kenneth M. French, 2 Hill, LLC and L.L.D., LLC
Defendant: Enpro Industries, Inc., Samuel G. Williamson, Goodrich Corporation, Enpro Holdings, Inc. and Enpro Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00046
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Enpro Holdings Inc., Enpro Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation. (Sykes, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #24 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
April 26, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION to Strike , #21 Response to Motion filed by L.L.D., LLC. (Liston, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Response to Motion filed by Enpro Holdings Inc., Enpro Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Strike filed by Enpro Holdings Inc., Enpro Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
April 2, 2019 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 re #20 Order Staying Case (rtc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STAYING CASE due to #14 MOTION to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/2/19. (cs)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION . (Liston, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L.L.D. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Material Profile Forms, #2 Exhibit 8-7-95 letter Townsend of Coltec, #3 Exhibit 9-5-95 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #4 Exhibit 1-29-2002 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #5 Exhibit 9-11-96 letter Plant Mgr to MDEQ, #6 Exhibit Stripper Tower TCE Levels, #7 Exhibit MDEQ Inspection Rpt 6-19-97, #8 Exhibit 4-23-96 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #9 Exhibit Analytical Analyses 12-22-95 to 7-24-96, #10 Exhibit DMRs 9-5-95 to 7-11-96, #11 Exhibit Williamson Regulatory Correspondence, #12 Exhibit Exerpt Purchase Agreement 5-31-96, #13 Exhibit Notice of Ownership Change, #14 Exhibit Excerpts Phase I Env Rpt 5-28-96, #15 Exhibit Excerpts Env Comp Audit 6-13-96, #16 Exhibit MDEQ Record of Tel Conv 9-26-95, #17 Exhibit Aff of John Shannon Crow, #18 Exhibit Aff of Jay Gore III, #19 Exhibit TIWC Site Rem Rpt 5-20-96) (Liston, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by L.L.D. LLC. (Liston, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike by L.L.D. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Aff of John Shannon Crow, #2 Exhibit Aff of Jay Gore III) (Liston, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND filed by L.L.D. LLC. (Liston, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by L.L.D. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Material Profile Forms, #2 Exhibit 8-7-95 letter Townsend of Coltec, #3 Exhibit 9-5-95 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #4 Exhibit 1-29-2002 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #5 Exhibit 9-11-96 letter Plant Mgr to MDEQ, #6 Exhibit Stripper Tower TCE Levels, #7 Exhibit MDEQ Inspection Rpt 6-19-97, #8 Exhibit 4-23-96 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #9 Exhibit Analytical Analyses 12-22-95 to 7-24-96, #10 Exhibit DMRs 9-5-95 to 7-11-96, #11 Exhibit Williamson Regulatory Correspondence, #12 Exhibit Exerpt Purchase Agreement 5-31-96, #13 Exhibit Notice of Ownership Change, #14 Exhibit Excerpts Phase I Env Rpt 5-28-96, #15 Exhibit Excerpts Env Comp Audit 6-13-96, #16 Exhibit MDEQ Record of Tel Conv 9-26-95, #17 Exhibit Aff of John Shannon Crow, #18 Exhibit Aff of Jay Gore III, #19 Exhibit TIWC Site Rem Rpt 5-20-96) (Liston, William)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 4/5/2019 Replies due by 4/26/2019.. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/11/2019. (bds)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by L.L.D. LLC. (Liston, William)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to EnPro Holdings, Inc. and Goodrich Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/6/19. (cs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court,,, (Unopposed) by Enpro Holdings, Inc., Goodrich Corporation. (Sykes, Phillip)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of Samuel G. Williamson (Forks, Joseph)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/19. (rtc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, . (Byars, Wilton)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Enpro Industries, Inc.. (Sykes, Phillip)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Failure to Register for CM/ECF: John Shannon Crow (tab)
March 1, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Enpro Holdings, Inc., Enpro Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Samuel G. Williamson, filed by Tyler Hill, James M. Colson, III, Rebecca R. Jones, B. J. Crawford, LLC, William M. (Mike) Williamson, L.L.D. LLC, Jennie M. Clement, Mildred M. Carpenter, Pamela A. Coe, Kenneth M. French, Marjorie Reid, Annie Fondon, Michael Fondon, Anita S. Mcgehee, Jill A. Clark, James L. Oliphant, Willis Van Winkle, Beverly Jean Walker, Emily M. Childs, Robert O. Walker, Nathaniel Ferguson, Erik Fearing, Margie P. French, John Wood, Fountain Square Professional Suites, LLC, Jason Paysinger, Jennifer Hill, Kimberly Fearing, Lauren Ferguson, Lorrie C. Williamson, Virginia Wood, Barbara A. Colson, Billy D. Childs, Clara Spence, 2 Hill LLC, Bobby H. Clark. (tab)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Enpro Holdings, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Enpro Industries, Inc. from Circuit Court of Yalobusha County Second Judicial District, case number CV-2019-9-JMY2. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1650428) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Enpro Holdings, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Enpro Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Record, #2 Exhibit A State Record Part 2, #3 Exhibit B State Court Summons to Enpro Industries, #4 Exhibit C Summons to Enpro Holdings, #5 Summons to Goodrich Corporation, #6 Exhibit E Affidavit For Receipts and Acceptance of Service, #7 Exhibit F Affidavit of Samuel G. Williamson, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.L.D., LLC et al v. Enpro Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie M. Clement
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O. Walker
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2 Hill LLC
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred M. Carpenter
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Fearing
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Wood
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. (Mike) Williamson
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Van Winkle
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fountain Square Professional Suites, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily M. Childs
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Spence
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Ferguson
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Ferguson
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Fondon
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fondon
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby H. Clark
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. J. Crawford, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Colson
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrie C. Williamson
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Paysinger
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hill
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Colson, III
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Fearing
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita S. Mcgehee
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.L.D. LLC
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Reid
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Oliphant
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca R. Jones
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill A. Clark
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Hill
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy D. Childs
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wood
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie P. French
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela A. Coe
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Jean Walker
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth M. French
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2 Hill, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.L.D., LLC
Represented By: Daniel Myles Martin
Represented By: William Liston, III
Represented By: Marquette William Wolf
Represented By: John Shannon Crow
Represented By: John J. Crow, Jr.
Represented By: William Lawrence Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enpro Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel G. Williamson
Represented By: Wilton V. Byars, III
Represented By: Joseph Miles Forks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enpro Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enpro Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?