Rasdon et al v. E 3 Trucking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jim Raines and Tammy Rasdon
Defendant: E3 Trucking Inc., Robert Aghajani and E 3 Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00100
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Robert Aghajani, E 3 Trucking, Inc.. (Dunbar, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Claim for Punitive Damages by Robert Aghajani, E 3 Trucking, Inc.. (Dunbar, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1st Set of Requests for Production of Documents by David C. Dunbar on behalf of E 3 Trucking, Inc. to Tammy Rasdon and Jim Raines. (Dunbar, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by David C. Dunbar on behalf of E 3 Trucking, Inc. to Tammy Rasdon and Jim Raines. (Dunbar, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Robert Aghajani. (Dunbar, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Dunbar, David)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/27/19. (bnd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Request for Admissions by David C. Dunbar on behalf of E3 Trucking Inc. to Tammy Rasdon & Jim Raines. (Dunbar, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Prodcution of Documents and Requests for Admission by William Monroe Quin, II on behalf of Jim Raines, Tammy Rasdon to E 3 Trucking, Inc.. (Quin, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Gerrard Dunnells on behalf of E3 Trucking Inc. (Dunnells, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/18/19. (rtc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by E3 Trucking Inc.. (Dunbar, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to E3 Trucking Inc., and Robert Aghajani (jla)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert Aghajani, E3 Trucking Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1677595, filed by Tammy Rasdon, Jim Raines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasdon et al v. E 3 Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E3 Trucking Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Gerrard Dunnells
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Aghajani
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E 3 Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher Gerrard Dunnells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Raines
Represented By: William Monroe Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Rasdon
Represented By: William Monroe Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?