Vise v. MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jada V. Vise
Defendant: MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC and Joaquin Garcia
Case Number: 3:2019cv00101
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Bruce S. Kramer,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1698364), #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jacob W. Brown,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1698379); Please file Certificate of Good Standing from state court (jla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael R. Kelly on behalf of Joaquin Garcia, MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC (Kelly, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jacob W. Brown,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1698379) by Jada V. Vise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ardis, Patrick)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Bruce S. Kramer,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1698364) by Jada V. Vise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ardis, Patrick)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/11/19. (rtc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert B. Adams on behalf of Joaquin Garcia, MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC (Adams, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joaquin Garcia, MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC. (Addison, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Michael Ardis on behalf of Jada V. Vise Joaquin Garcia served on 6/2/2019. (Ardis, Patrick)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Michael Ardis on behalf of Jada V. Vise MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC served on 5/22/2019. (Ardis, Patrick)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joaquin Garcia. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1679041, filed by Jada V. Vise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/15/2019) (jwr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vise v. MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts Mississippi, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Addison
Represented By: Michael R. Kelly
Represented By: Robert B. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joaquin Garcia
Represented By: Robert S. Addison
Represented By: Michael R. Kelly
Represented By: Robert B. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jada V. Vise
Represented By: Patrick Michael Ardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?