Goodwin et al v. Guaranty Bank and Trust Company

Plaintiff: Prentis W. Goodwin and Kim A. Goodwin
Defendant: Guaranty Bank and Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00102
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert D. Flynn on behalf of Prentis W. Goodwin Guaranty Bank and Trust Company served on 7/1/2019. (Flynn, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Guaranty Bank and Trust Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Guaranty Bank and Trust by Robert D. Flynn on behalf of Prentis W. Goodwin (Flynn, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Guaranty Bank and Trust Company (jla)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Robert D. Flynn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/22/19. (bnd)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Robert D. Flynn,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1681146) by Kim A. Goodwin, Prentis W. Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TN Supreme Ct. Certificate of Good Standing) (Burgoyne, Garry)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1679318, filed by Prentis W. Goodwin, Kim A. Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A MicroMerge Credit Profile, #2 Exhibit B Email May 24, 2018, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin et al v. Guaranty Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentis W. Goodwin
Represented By: Garry Marc Burgoyne
Represented By: Robert D. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim A. Goodwin
Represented By: Garry Marc Burgoyne
Represented By: Robert D. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranty Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?